Dong Ah Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd v. Glasforms Inc.,

Case Number: 5:2006cv03359
Filed: May 23, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2010 504 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 440 , 444 , 449 , 452 , 454 , 493 , 495 POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/23/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
November 25, 2009 498 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE 495 OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/24/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 5, 2009 494 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) GRANTING 446 , 447 MOTIONS FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT PENDING DISPOSITION OF POST-TRIAL MOTIONS; AND (2) IMPOSING TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER ENJOINING CTGNA AND TAISHAN FROM TRANSFERRING OR DISPOSING OF ASSETS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 29, 2009 486 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 318 GRANTING GLASFORMS, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR MONETARY AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
August 21, 2009 388 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM re 385 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/21/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 12, 2009 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING IN PART 315 REMAINING OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/11/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
July 20, 2009 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING IN PART 315 OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/20/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 6, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Certain Pretrial Deadlines re 302 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/2/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 91 150 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 7/2/09. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 18, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: BRIEFING ON MOTION TO COMPEL 142 242 Signed by Judge Seeborg (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 11, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 232 AS TO FURTHER BRIEFING ON GLASFORMS'S MOTION TO COMPEL (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 4, 2009 233 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO FURTHER BRIEFING ON GLASFORMS'S MOTION TO COMPEL RE: 232 Stipulation filed by Glasforms Inc. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
April 13, 2009 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg denying 208 Motion to Seal (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 151 MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/9/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 1, 2009 225 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 222 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009) Modified on 4/17/2009 (rslc2, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2009 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 183 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 9, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 218 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 25, 2009 202 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 187 as to Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/23/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 23, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 200 Stipulation filed by Glasforms Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/23/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 10, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 188 Stipulation filed by Glasforms Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/10/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
January 27, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING 177 OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/26/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
December 15, 2008 174 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 173 to Vacate both the Pretrial Conference Scheduled for January 9, 2009 and Trial Date of January 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/10/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 5, 2008 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 171 REVISED STIPULATION TO TOLL LITIGATION ACTIVITY AND COURT-ORDERED DEADLINES PENDING MEDIATION. Status Conference set for 1/16/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/5/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 6, 2008 170 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 169 to Toll Litigation Activity and Court-Ordered Deadlines Pending Mediation. Status Conference set for 12/19/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 29, 2008 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 146 Motion to Compel; denying 147 Motion for Sanctions (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 19, 2008 150 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 91 MOTION for Sanctions Due to Spoliation of Evidence filed by Glasforms Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 3, 2008 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dong Ah Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd v. Glasforms Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?