In re Trident Microsystems, Inc. Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv03440
Filed: May 26, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2011 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/15/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
February 17, 2011 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE (granting 212 ). Final Approval Hearing set for 4/15/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/17/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
October 25, 2010 199 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT FRANK LIN'S COUNTERCLAIMS (approving 198 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/25/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 20, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/20/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 15, 2010 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 187 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 13, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 27, 2010 183 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER COMPLAINT (approving 182 ). The Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2010 is RESET for 12/3/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 2, 2010 181 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND NOMINAL DEFENDANT TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO FRANK LIN'S COUNTERCLAIMS (approving 176 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 20, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT FRANK LIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER COMPLAINT AND SETTING DATE FOR RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS, INC. TO PLAI NTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT LIN'S COUNTERCLAIM (approving 173 ). Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/20/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
July 19, 2010 169 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT FRANK LIN'S COUNTERCLAIMS re 165 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/30/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
February 3, 2010 151 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PARTIAL DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE (approving 150 ). The Final Approval Hearing set for 2/5/2010 is RESET for 3/26/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
October 23, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PARTIAL DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/23/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 14, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT (approving 141 as modified by the Court). The hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement is continued to 10/23/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/13/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
August 19, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION, APPLICATION AND ORDER TO VACATE HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL AND TO RENEW MOTION TO (A) TERMINATE AND DISMISS AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS OTHER THAN FRANK C. LIN, AND (B) PRELIMINARILY APPROVE SETTLEMENTS (approving 138 ). The Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2009 is VACATED. A new Motion Hearing is set for 10/9/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/19/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
April 17, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull re 114 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 6, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS FROM THE SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE AND VACATING THE MAY 1, 2009 HEARING ON THE SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE'S MOTION TO TERMINATE (approving 112 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/6/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
January 27, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 103 of Substitution of Counsel for Defendant W. Stephen Rowe. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/26/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
September 17, 2008 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/12/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Trident Microsystems, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?