In re KLA-Tencor Corp., Shareholder Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv03445
Filed: May 26, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2010 667 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re (656 in 5:06-cv-03445-JW) MOTION for Final Approval of Derivative Settlement. The Clerk of Court shall close this file and all member cases. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/26/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
March 12, 2010 641 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Proposed Settlement Schedule re 640 Stipulation.The parties shall file a signed Stipulation of Settlement and Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of the settlement of this action, which shall be joined by all partie s, on or before 3/15/2010. The Court will conduct a hearing on the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, as previously scheduled, on 3/22/2010 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 1, 2010 630 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 629 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, 601 MOTION to Remove. The requesting party SHALL e-file the redacted versions of such documents to the docket. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/1/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010) Modified on 3/1/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 582 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT for Preliminary Approval Hearing Date re 580 Status Report. Deadline to File Joint Case Management Conference statement by 1/15/2010. Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 9, 2009 579 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Extending the Date for Filing an Amended Complaint; Continuing Status Conference re 578 Status Report, 577 Clerks Notice. Amended complaint due 12/22/2009. Joint Status Statement due 1/15/2010. Status Conference set for 1/25/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 23, 2009 568 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Extending the Date for Filing an Amended Complaint by 12/8/2009 re 565 Status Report. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/23/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 3, 2009 564 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Extending Time the Time for Filing an Amended Complaint re 563 Status Report. Deadline to file Amended Complaint by 11/23/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 22, 2009 562 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DATE FOR FILING AN AMENDED COMPLAINT re 561 Status Report. Amended Complaint due 11/2/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/22/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 9, 2009 559 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 558 Stipulation. Amended Complaint due 10/23/2009. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 12/4/2009. The Statement shall include, among other things, an update on the parties' settlemen t efforts and the parties' proposed schedule re: anticipated Motions to Dismiss. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
August 27, 2009 555 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 553 Case Management Statement. The 8/31/2009 case management conference is VACATED. The Court ORDERS as follows: Amended Complaint due by 10/9/2009. Motion Hearing re Motion to Dismiss set for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. All motions shall be filed in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 12/4/2009. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2009 10:00 AM. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
May 28, 2009 532 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Pending the Ninth Circuit's resolution of any interlocutory issues before it, the Court STAYS this action. Within ten (10) days of the resolution of any such issues by the Ninth Circuit, either party may move to lift the stay. The case management conference scheduled for June1, 2009 is VACATED. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
April 3, 2009 531 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 4/6/2009 to 6/1/2009 re 530 Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 19, 2009 529 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Extending Time for Filing Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re 528 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 11, 2009 526 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME FOR FILING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL re 525 Stipulation. Deadline to file motion due by 3/16/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
February 20, 2009 519 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 513 Stipulation filed by KLA-Tencor Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 20, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 511 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT re 509 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due 3/30/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 6, 2009 499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING THE COURTS DECEMBER 12, 2008 ORDER; GRANTING DEFENDANT SCHROEDERS MOTION TO CORRECT re 487 MOTION Correction to 12/12/08 Order and Objection to Publication of Unredacted Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/5/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009) Modified docket text on 1/12/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 393 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 392 Notice (Other) filed by Kenneth Schroeder, 322 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY THE SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE OF KLA-TENCOR CORPORATIONS BOARD OF DIRECTORS TO PLAINTIFF BUT WITHHELD FROM DEF ENDANT KENNETH L. SCHROEDER filed by Kenneth Schroeder, Motions terminated: 322 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY THE SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE OF KLA-TENCOR CORPORATIONS BOARD OF DIRECTORS TO PLAINTIFF BUT WITHHELD FROM DEFENDANT KENNETH L. SCHROEDER filed by Kenneth Schroeder. Hearing on 9/16/08 before Judge Lloyd is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/15/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 11, 2008 391 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 264 Stipulation filed by Special Litigation Committee of the Board of Directors of KLA-Tencor Corporation. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/11/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re KLA-Tencor Corp., Shareholder Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?