In re McAfee, Inc. Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv03484
Filed: May 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE AND (2) TERMINATING MOTION FOR RECUSAL OF COUNSEL (terminating 153 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
January 6, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 140 Adjudication of Remaining Claims. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 1, 2008 138 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON GEORGE SAMENUK'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (approving docket no. 137 ). Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/1/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 17, 2008 135 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON GEORGE SAMENUK'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (approving docket no. 134 ). Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/17/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 9, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE. Final Approval Hearing set for 1/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/9/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 1, 2008 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON OCTOBER 3, 2008 Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/1/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 24, 2008 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/19/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re McAfee, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?