In re Sanmina-SCI Corp. Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv03783
Filed: June 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/4/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
February 27, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL PRELIMINARILY APPROVING DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING NOTICE (granting 118 ). (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
October 29, 2008 114 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving docket no. 113 ). Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 12/12/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/29/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 16, 2008 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/12/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 12, 2008 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 109 Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/12/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Sanmina-SCI Corp. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?