IO Group, Inc. v. Veoh Networks, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Io Group, Inc. alleged that Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. infringed the copyrights in Plaintiff's works by reproducing, distributing and displaying the works on Defendant's website without Plaintiff's approval or authorization.

Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.
Defendant: Veoh Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2006cv03926
Filed: June 23, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order FILE located at Federal Records Center (FRC), San Bruno, CA: Accession No: 021-2009-5152, Box No: 96. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to File a Bill of Costs and Motion for Full Costs and Attorneys' Fees. Defendant's bill of costs and motion for fees/costs due by 9/17/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/10/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION REQUESTING THE COURT TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE A BILL OF COSTS AND MOTION FOR FULL COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 9/9/2008) Modified on 9/9/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 JUDGMENT. Judgment entered in favor of defendant. Clerk to close file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/27/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 77 , 78 parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 115 Joint Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3(d) filed by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A , # 2 Exhibit Attachment 1 to Statement of Recent Decision) (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/15/2008)Text Modified on 8/18/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff IO Group, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief 109 filed by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 11/16/2007) Text modified on 11/16/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 109 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing. Defendant's response due by 11/16/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 (Proposed) Order Denying Plaintiff's Administrative Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief Explaining Relevance of Recently Issued Authority re 111 by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/25/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc's in Opposition to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief; [Proposed] Order re ( 109 ) filed by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/25/2007) Modified text to add linkage on 10/26/2007 (srm, COURT STAFF). Text modified on 10/30/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of MOTION forAdministrative Relief to File Supplemental Brief 109 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Related document(s) 109 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 10/22/2007) Text modified on 10/23/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Administrative MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Explaining Relevance of Recently issued Authority; and (Proposed) Order filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Supplemental Brief and Grokster Order)(Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 10/22/2007) Text modified on 10/23/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Vacating Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/18/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2007)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Supplemental Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 78 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Papa Deposition Excerpts# 2 Exhibit Dunning Deposition Excerpts# 3 Errata Shapiro Deposition Excerpts# 4 Exhibit Styn Deposition Excerpts# 5 Exhibit Bilger Deposition Excerpts)(Related document(s) 78 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Text modified on 9/5/2007 to conform to document caption post by cousnel (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 93 Motion to Seal Documents. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2007 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 9/4/2007) re 77 , 93 , 78 .(Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2007)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief in the Form of an Order to File Documents Under Seal by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/23/2007) Modified on 8/24/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 87 Motion for Leave to Appear Amici Curiae. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 99 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Papa Exhibit Pages# 2 Exhibit Styn Exhibit Pages# 3 Exhibit Veoh v. UMG Complaint)(Related document(s) 99 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/21/2007) Text modified on 8/22/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Declaration of Keith Ruoff in Support of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 99 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Related document(s) 99 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/21/2007) Text modified on 8/22/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 77 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/21/2007) Text modified on 8/22/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply in support of its Motion for Summay Judgment re 97 filed by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/21/2007) Text modified on 8/22/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment ( 77 ) filed by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/21/2007) Modified on 8/22/2007, hyper link added (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 EXHIBITS (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by IO Group, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Received (Proposed) Order to File Documents Under Seal by IO Group, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Received Documents submitted Under Seal by IO Group, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 (Proposed) Order to File Documents Under Seal re 93 by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Modified on 8/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief in the Form of an Order to File Documents Under Seal 93 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-mail)(Related document(s) 93 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Text modified on 8/21/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Declaration of Keith Ruoff in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief in the Form of an Order to File Documents Under Seal 93 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Text modified on 8/21/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Administrative Relief in the form of an Order to File Documents Under Seal filed by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Text modified on 8/21/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Proposed Order Denying Viacom International Inc. and NBC Universal's Motion For Administrative Relief For Leave to Appear and File Brief as Amici Curiae re 90 by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/17/2007) Text modified on 8/20/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux in Support of Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Opposition to Viacom International Inc. and NBC Universal's Motion For Administrative Relief For Leave to Appear and File Brief as Amici Curiae 90 filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/17/2007) Text modified on 8/20/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Opposition to Viacom International Inc. and NBC Universal's Motion For Administrative Relief For Leave to Appear and File Brief as Amici Curiae filed by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/17/2007) Text modified on 8/20/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Statement of Non-Opposition Viacon International and NBC Universal,.Inc's Motion for Leave to Appear Amici Curiae re 87 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Related document(s) 87 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/16/2007) Text modified on 8/17/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc 's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 78 by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ted Dunning in Support of Veoh's Opposition# 2 Declaration of Matthew Scherb in Support of Veoh's Opposition)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 8/14/2007) Text modified on 8/15/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Local Rule 7-11 MOTION for Administrative Relief of ViaCom International, Inc. and NBC Universal, Inc. for Leave to Appear and File Brief as Amici Curiae filed by Viacom International Inc., NBC Universal, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae# 3 Exhibit A to Brief of Amici Curiae)(Pagnanelli, Karin) (Filed on 8/14/2007) Text modified on 8/15/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Certification of Interested Parties by Karin G. Pagnanelli re: Viacom International and NBC Universal, Inc. (Pagnanelli, Karin) (Filed on 8/14/2007) Text modified on 8/15/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Declaration of Keith Ruoff in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 83 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Registration Pages)(Related document(s) 83 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/14/2007) Text modified on 8/15/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 83 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Papa Deposition Excerpts# 2 Exhibit Styn Deposition Excerpts)(Related document(s) 83 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/14/2007) Text modified on 8/15/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement re 77 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 8/14/2007) Text modified on 8/15/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IO Group, Inc. re 80 Declaration in Support, 79 Declaration in Support, 81 Proposed Order, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Text modified on 8/7/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiff IO Group, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment re 78 by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Text modified on 8/7/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability re 78 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Papa Declaration Excerpts# 2 Papa Deposition Ex. #3# 3 Papa Deposition Ex. #11# 4 Papa Deposition Ex. #16# 5 Dunning Deposition Excerpts# 6 Shapiro Deposition Excerpts# 7 Shapiro Deposition Ex. #5# 8 Styn Deposition Excerpts# 9 Bilger Deposition Excerpts)(Related document(s) 78 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Text modified on 8/7/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Declaration of Keith Ruoff in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability re 78 filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 78 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Text modified on 8/7/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Plaintiff's Notice of MOTION and MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by IO Group, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Text modified on 8/7/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc's Notice of MOTION and MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Dunning Declaration# 2 Papa Declaration# 3 Scherb Declaration# 4 Proposed Order) (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 7/30/2007) Text modified on 8/7/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Parties' motion and opposition briefs not to exceed 30 pages. Reply briefs not to exceed 20 pages. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Allowing Parties to Exceed Otherwise Applicable Page Limitations; (Proposed) Order re 73 filed by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Scherb) (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Text modified on 8/7/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/8/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of Plainitff's Motion for Order Allowing Parties to Exceed Otherwise Applicable Page Limitations 73 by IO Group, Inc. (Related document(s) 73 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Text modified on 7/23/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Motion for Order Allowing Parties to Exceed Otherwise Applicable Page Limitations and (Proposed) Order filed by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Text modified on 7/23/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Certain Discovery Cut-Off Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/30/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2007)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND CERTAIN DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Joint Stipulation Regarding Responses to Plaintiff's Document Requests and Maintenance of Electronic Data and ORDER. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Stipulated Request to File Papers Under Seal. Parties' "Joint Stipulation Regarding Responses to Planitiff's Document Requests and Maintenance of Electronic Data" to be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/26/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Joint Stipulation Regarding Responses to Planitiff's Document Requests and Maintenance of Electronic Data" (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Proof of Service by Veoh Networks, Inc. (Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/25/2007) Text modified on 4/26/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Stipulated Motion to File Papers Under Seal filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scherb, Matthew) (Filed on 4/25/2007) Text modified on 4/26/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2007 01:30 PM. Discovery due by 5/30/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting Stipulated Request to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Dates. Fact discovery cutoff: 5/30/2007. Designation of experts with reports by 6/8/2007. Designation of rebuttal experts with reports by 6/22/2007. Expert discovery cutoff: 7/23/2007. Last day for hearing on dispositive motions: 9/4/2007, 10:00 AM. Final pretrial conference: 10/16/2007, 1:30 PM. Start of jury trial (estimated 7 days): 10/22/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/23/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd Granting in Part and Denying in Part 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2007 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 4/10/2007) re 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by IO Group, Inc.,. (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2007)
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of Plaintiff's Reply 60 filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 60 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 3/26/2007) Text modified on 3/28/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Reply to Defendant Veoh Network's Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents Requests numbered 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 109, 11, 12, 14, 16, 21, 22, 23, and 24 re 58 filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 3/26/2007) Text modified on 3/28/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux in Support of Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff IO Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Requests Numbered 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 14, 16, 21, 22, 23, and 24 re 58 filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 58 ) (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2007) Text modified on 3/21/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff IO Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents Requests Numbered 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 14, 16, 21, 22, 23, and 24 filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2007) Text modified on 3/21/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/14/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 3/2/2007) Modified on 3/2/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Notice of MOTION and Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Requested #s are: 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 14, 16, 21, 22, 23 and 24 filed by IO Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents)(Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 3/2/2007) Text Modified on 3/2/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held. Settlement discussions ongoing. (Date Filed: 2/12/2007). (not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT VEOH NETOWORKS, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/31/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jennifer A. Golinveaux [Proposed] Order (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/26/2007)
January 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2007 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/07. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re Stipulation Extending Time to Complete Initial Disclosures Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/22/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION To Order Extending Time to Complete Initial Disclosures Under FRCP 26 by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation Extending Time to Complete Initial Disclosures Under FRCP 26)(Morehous, Dean) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Dean A. Morehous, Jr (Morehous, Dean) (Filed on 12/11/2006)
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by Veoh Networks, Inc. of Law Firm Name Change (Morehous, Dean) (Filed on 12/11/2006)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties referred to Magistrate Judge Seeborg for early settlement conference, with conference to be held within 90 days of date of order. Fact discovery cutoff: 4/30/2007. Designation of experts with reports: 5/8/2007. Designation of rebuttal experts with reports: 5/22/2007. Expert discovery cutoff: 6/22/2007. Last day for hearing on dispositive motions: 7/31/2007, 10:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2007 01:30 PM. Start of jury trial (estimated 7 days): 9/24/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/5/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2006)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2006 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 12/5/2006). (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2006)
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 12/4/06 by RWS. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2006)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Veoh Networks, Inc... (Morehous, Dean) (Filed on 11/27/2006)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 12/4/06 at 10:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006)
November 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IO Group, Inc... (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 11/23/2006)
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and (Proposed( Order filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 11/22/2006) Text modified on 11/29/2006 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE Re-Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2006 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2006. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2006)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case Nos. C06-03926, C06-05162 and C06-05334 are related. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/25/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of 34 Reply to Opposition Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byIO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.# 2 Exhibit B.# 3 Exhibit C.# 4 Exhibit D.)(Related document(s) 34 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 10/20/2006)
October 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Reply to Veoh Network's Opposition to PLaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 10/20/2006) Text modified on 10/20/2006 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Veoh Networks, Inc. re 30 Memorandum in Opposition, 32 Proposed Order, 31 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion (Fakler, Paul) (Filed on 10/19/2006)
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Proposed Order re 5 MOTION for ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF (Notice of Related Cases) by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Fakler, Paul) (Filed on 10/19/2006)
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Declaration of Paul M. Fakler in Opposition to Plaintiff's 5 ADMINISTRATIVE Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B# 2 Exhibit C-D)(Fakler, Paul) (Filed on 10/19/2006) Text modified on 10/20/2006 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition re 5 MOTION for ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF (Notice of Related Cases) filed byVeoh Networks, Inc.. (Fakler, Paul) (Filed on 10/19/2006)
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER to File Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/26/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Certification of Interested Entities and Persons by Veoh Networks, Inc (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2006)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Received Document: Certification of Interested Entities and Persons (DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL) by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2006)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Personal Service by Messenger by Veoh Networks, Inc. re: Service of DEFENDANT VEOH NETWORKS, INC.'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES AND PERSONS CONFIDENTIAL - DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL (Morehous, Dean) (Filed on 9/25/2006) Text modified on 9/26/2006 to conform to document post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Declaration of Paul M. Fakler in Support of 25 Stipulated Administrative Motion for Leave to File Certification of Interested Entities Under Seal filed byVeoh Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Fakler, Paul) (Filed on 9/25/2006) Text modified on 9/25/2006 to conform to document post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED Administrative Motion and (Proposed) Order For Leave to File Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Under Seal by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Fakler, Paul) (Filed on 9/25/2006) Text modified on 9/25/2006 to conform to document post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint byVeoh Networks, Inc.. (Fakler, Paul) (Filed on 9/25/2006)
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Further Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's NOtice of Related Cases and to Reset Dates Relating to Case Management Conference. Initial case management conference currently set for 10/17/2006, 1:30 p.m. is taken off calendar. Plaintiff's administrative motion for related case determination will be deemed submitted for decision as of 10/20/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/22/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by IO Group, Inc.. Service waived by Veoh Networks, Inc. waiver sent on 6/23/2006, answer due 8/22/2006. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 9/21/2006)
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to CT Corporation, registered Agent for Veoh Networks, Inc. on 06/23/2006 by IO Group, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 7/24/2006. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 9/21/2006)
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of 19 Stipulation, filed byIO Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 19 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 9/21/2006)
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; AND TO RESET DATES RELATING TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 9/21/2006)
September 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 15 Application for Admission of Michael S. Elkin Pro Hac Vice. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2006)
September 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 13 Application for Admission of Paul M. Fakler Pro Hac Vice. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2006)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE by Veoh Networks, Inc. re Received Document, 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Received Document (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Michael M Elkin for Pro Hac Vice by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Michael S. Elkin (fee paid, receipt # 5515344) filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by Veoh Networks, Inc. re Received Document, 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Received Document (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Paul M. Fakler for Pro Hac Vice by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Paul M. Fakler (fee paid, receipt # 5515344) filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate. Defendant's response due by 9/25/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/14/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 8 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/14/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006)
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Declaration of Dean A. Morehous in Support of 9 Stipulation and (PROPOSED) Order o Extend Time To Respond To Motion to Consolidate filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 9 ) (Morehous, Dean) (Filed on 9/13/2006) Text modified on 9/14/2006 to conform to document post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and (PROPOSED) ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Veoh Networks, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate re 5 by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Morehous, Dean) (Filed on 9/13/2006) Text modified on 9/14/2006 to conform to document post by counsel(bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Dean A. Morehous, Jr (Morehous, Dean) (Filed on 9/13/2006)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Order re 5 MOTION for ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF (Notice of Related Cases) by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Declaration of Gill Sperlein in Support of 5 MOTION for ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF (Notice of Related Cases) filed byIO Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF (Notice of Related Cases) filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, Dennis) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
August 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2006 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2006)
August 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Case Management Conference and Extension of Date to File Answer. Defendant's responsive pleading due by 9/25/2006. Joint case management statement due by 10/10/2006. Initial case management conference set for 10/17/2006, 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/21/06. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2006)
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Case Management Conference and Extension of Date to File Answer by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Steuer, David) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2006)
June 23, 2006 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
June 23, 2006 Opinion or Order *** DOCKETED IN ERROR****CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing., CASE REFERRED to Early Neutral Evaluation (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006) Modified on 6/27/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Veoh Networks, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
June 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2006. Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2006 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Veoh Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 3387035.). Filed byIO Group, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IO Group, Inc. v. Veoh Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veoh Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?