Leo Jimenez, Jr. v. Joanne Barnhart

Case Number: 5:2006cv03939
Filed: June 23, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Social Security: Black Lung
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 19, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 to Remove Status Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/19/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 1, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 to Continue Status Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 26, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 12 15 the Parties' Respective Motions for Summary Judgment; and ORDER to Defendant to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Remanded With Directions to Award Benefits. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leo Jimenez, Jr. v. Joanne Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?