Dodd-Owens et al v. Kyphon, Inc.

Case Number: 5:2006cv03988
Filed: June 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST KYPHON INC. re 168 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/23/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
December 30, 2008 164 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF NATALIE AMAYA'S CLAIMS re 160 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/19/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
October 27, 2008 155 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/27/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 24, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 150 MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/24/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd-Owens et al v. Kyphon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?