United States Of America v. Aspen Ventures III,L.P.

Case Number: 5:2006cv04032
Filed: June 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:631 Small Business Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 27, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
July 14, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
September 2, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion 50 to Reopen Case for Purpose of Approving the Procedures for Winding Up and Terminating the Receivership. Motions terminated: 50 MOTION for Hearing filed by Aspen Ventures III,L.P., 52 MOTION to Reopen Case for Purpose o f Approving and Confirming the Third Receiver's Report, 54 MOTION to Reopen Case for Purpose of Approving the Procedures for Winding Up and Terminating the Receivership. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 19, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: APPOINTMENT OF ALTERNATIVE RECEIVER re 30 Order to Show Cause,. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 19, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Aspen Ventures III,L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?