21X Capital Ltd., et al v. Werra et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv04135
Filed: July 3, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2011 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER In light of the parties representation, the Court finds that a Case Management Conferencenot necessary at this time. Accordingly, the Cort VACATES the April 4 Conference.The Clerk of Court shall close this file.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/30/11. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 9, 2011 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 257 USCA Memorandum. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
October 30, 2009 242 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING SUPERSEDES BOND re 241 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
May 27, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 27, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
April 16, 2009 210 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses Against Plaintiff 21X Capitol, Ltd. from 5/11/2009 to 6/1/2009 re 208 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 206 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Against Plaintiff 21X Capitol, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
March 19, 2009 204 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 19, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
January 14, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - BENCH TRIAL:. Bench Trial set for 2/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
September 30, 2008 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING RULE 706 EXPERT re 144 Joint Case Management Statement filed by John Werra, Robert Werra, 140 Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 30, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 18, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPOINT A RULE 706 EXPERT WITNESS. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 18, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 15, 2008 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ESTABLISHING LAW OF THE CASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 15, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
February 8, 2008 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Advancing Pretrial Conference from 6/2/2008 to 2/25/2008 re 68 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by 21X Capital Ltd.,, David A. Brewer. Joint Pretrial Statement due 2/15/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/8/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 21X Capital Ltd., et al v. Werra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?