Owens v. Padilla et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv04778
Filed: August 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 71 Motion for Relief Under Rule 60(B). (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
September 30, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/30/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
February 12, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 15, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 37 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
October 20, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 29 of Service Upon Defendant Schlosser by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
September 29, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Provide Location Information for Unserved Defendant Salazar. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/29/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 23, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 28 Extending Time for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Discovery Requests. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/23/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Padilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?