Victoria Ryan v. Editions Limited West, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv04812
Filed: August 9, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2016 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 308 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and to Quash Plaintiff's Request for Additional Attorney's Fees. The hearing scheduled for 9/29/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/23/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
April 21, 2016 306 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEBTOR'S EXAM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 21, 2016, re 305 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
February 24, 2016 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE SURETY'S LIABILITY FOR FEE AWARD by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 296 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 5, 2016 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WRIT OF EXECUTION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 5, 2016, re 289 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 4, 2016 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 4, 2016, re 289 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 19, 2016 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR FEES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 19, 2016, re 276 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
February 1, 2013 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 243 MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL AND DENYING 251 MOTION TO VACATE EXTENSION OF AUTOMATIC STAY by Judge Paul S. Grewal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 18, 2012 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS re Docket No. 235 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 18, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
July 2, 2012 234 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 2, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
March 26, 2012 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF VICTORIA RYAN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 226 Motion to Amend/Correct; (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
January 26, 2012 228 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT re 227 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 226 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION filed by Editions Limited West, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 26, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
December 27, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFF VICTORIA RYAN'S MOTION IN LIMINE; FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 204 Motion in Limine (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 1, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL; ORDER RESETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE re 196 Stipulation filed by Victoria Ryan. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 1, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
August 19, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE, LAST DAY FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING, FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL re 194 Stipulation, filed by Editions Limited West, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 19, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
May 10, 2011 192 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 10, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
October 12, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EDITIONS LIMITED WEST, INC.'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES re 144 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Editions Limited West, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 12, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
August 12, 2009 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 155 Motion for Reconsideration and Denying 159 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY PENDING RULING ON PLAINTIFF RYAN'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED DEFENDANT EDITIONS LIMITED WEST, INC.'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES re 157 Stipulation, filed by Victoria Ryan. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 17, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 14, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CHANGE THE HEARING DATE re 151 Stipulation filed by Victoria Ryan, 152 Stipulation filed by Victoria Ryan. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 14, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 13, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED DEFENDANT EDITIONS LIMITED WEST, INC.'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 144 Motion for Attorney Fees (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
October 22, 2008 137 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 136 Stipulation filed by Victoria Ryan. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 22, 2008. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 30, 2008 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF VICTORIA RYAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying 113 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 15, 2008 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EDITIONS LIMITED WEST, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 127 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victoria Ryan v. Editions Limited West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?