Bates v. City of San Jose et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv05302
Filed: August 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 72 Motion for Relief from Judgment.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
October 25, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court Statement re 77 Request for Indicative Ruling. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
August 12, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Response to plaintiff's leter. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/12/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 10, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for withdrawal of counsel and leave to proceed pro se. Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/10/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 1, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 57 Motion to Reopen Time to File an Appeal.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
April 26, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 43 Motion for Relief from Judgment.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
March 18, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 47 Continuing Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Rue 60 Motion for Relief From Judgment. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION Notice of Motion; Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FRCP Rule 60(b)(4) and Rule 60(d)(3) re 36 Costs Taxed. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/18/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?