Genesis Insurance Company v. Magma Design Automation, Inc.

Case Number: 5:2006cv05526
Filed: September 8, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 351 Magma Design Automation, Inc.'s Motion for relief from Non-dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 350 Order on Discovery Letter Brief. ***Set Deadline: Written Opposition is due by 7/12/2016. Opposition brief SHA LL NOT EXCEED 5 pages in length. NO REPLY BRIEF shall be filed or considered. Motion will then be deemed submitted for decision and the court will issue an order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 31, 2016 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 348 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
February 9, 2016 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Conference Statement (Dkt. No. 335 ), the court has determined that a scheduling conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for February 11, 2016, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/9/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
September 1, 2015 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to FRCP 54(b), the court will enter final judgment. Genesis shall file a proposed judgment on or before 9/9/2015. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 9/3/2015 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 2/11/2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 2/4/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/1/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 31, 2015 313 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting Genesis's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part Magma's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
July 8, 2015 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 278 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 281 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This case is scheduled for a Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 9/3/2015. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before 8/27/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/8/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
January 8, 2015 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Compliance with Summary Judgment Provisions of Standing Order. On 1/8/2015, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Summary Judgment 275 which does not comply with all relevant provisions of the undersigned's Standing Order for Civil Cases. Since the motion was filed only 35 days before reserved hearing date, Plaintiff is notified that the motion will be terminated unless its deficiencies are resolved by 5:00 p.m. on 1/9/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
September 18, 2014 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 270 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT EXECUTIVE RISK INDEMNITY, INC. TO FILE INITIAL RESPONSE TO NATIONALUNION'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Response due 9/30/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/18/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 3, 2014 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 268 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT EXECUTIVE RISK INDEMNITY, INC. TO FILE INITIAL RESPONSE TO NATIONAL UNIONS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the Parties' undersigned counsel that ERII shall file its initial response to National Union's operative Third Party Complaint on or before September 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/3/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
August 6, 2014 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 261 Stipulation to Dismiss Counterclaims with Prejudice filed by Magma Design Automation, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
December 5, 2013 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 233 237 NATIONAL UNION'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AUTHORIZING THE PARTIES TO TAKE LIMITED DISCOVERY; AND DENYING 221 GENESIS'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TAXATION OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
May 1, 2013 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to the court furlough, the Case Management Conference scheduled for May 3, 2013, is CONTINUED to May 24, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
March 7, 2013 219 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 217 Stipulation Discharging Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/7/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 9, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing re 194 Letter filed by Magma Design Automation, Inc. On or before February 18, 2011, the parties shall file supplemental briefing explaining the grounds for Genesis and Magma's objection regarding the for m of the judgment and addressing the issue of how the Court should calculate prejudgment interest for the purposes of issuing judgment. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 9, 2011. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011) Modified text on 2/9/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 165 STIPULATION EXTENDING DATE TO FILE REPLY BRIEFS. Reply briefs due 11/29/2010. The Motion hearing remains as previously set for 12/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
September 17, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) re 155 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Court hereby DISMISSES, with prejudice, (1) the Third-Party Complaint filed by Magma (re 11 ) as to ERII only, and (2) the Third-Party Cou nterclaim filed by ERII against Magma (re 26 ), each side to bear its own fees and costs. Magma's Third-Party Complaint against defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa. is not hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
July 16, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 139 USCA Memorandum. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2010. The Statement shall include, among other things, the parties' position with respect to the next stage of the litigation in light of the remand, and a proposed schedule to advance the case. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
September 17, 2008 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference; Finding as Moot re 114 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc., 113 Case Management Statement. The Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2008 is VACATED. The Court to issue final judgment in due course. Motions terminated: 114 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/17/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genesis Insurance Company v. Magma Design Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?