Foster v. KNTV Television, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv05688
Filed: September 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 84 , 91 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/9/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
October 6, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/6/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 21, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/18/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
July 20, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Status and Setting Status Conference. Status Conference set for 8/14/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on July 20, 2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. KNTV Television, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?