Agilent Technologies Inc., v. Affymetrix, Inc.

Case Number: 5:2006cv05958
Filed: September 26, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Judgment 92 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
December 8, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Continuing Case Management Conference and Setting Hearing re 90 Case Management Statement. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 3/12/2010. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
November 3, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING 11/9/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 88 Case Management Statement. Joint Case Management Conference due by 12/4/2009. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
September 24, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 9/28/2009 to 11/9/2009 re 84 Case Management Statement. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 10/30/2009. The Statement shall include, among other things, an update on the en banc petition and to the extent relevant, the parties proposed schedule on how the case should proceed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/24/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
July 10, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF FEDERAL CIRCUIT REMAND re 82 Appeal Remark. Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 9/18/2009. Case Management conference set for 9/28/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agilent Technologies Inc., v. Affymetrix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?