Joe Charvez v. County of Santa Clara

Case Number: 5:2006cv06126
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 52 for Voluntary Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/25/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
January 20, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 47 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/20/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
October 20, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 45 Continuing Case Management Conference: Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
June 17, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 41 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/17/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
December 10, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 37 to Vacate February 13, 2009 Hearing Date: Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M.Whyte on 12/10/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Charvez v. County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?