In re Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. Securities Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv06286
Filed: October 5, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2015 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 305 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
November 13, 2009 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Whyte granting 286 Motion for Settlement; granting 287 Motion for Attorney Fees (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
July 31, 2009 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 279 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
May 7, 2009 276 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 271 Regarding Lead Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/7/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 21, 2009 270 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 268 Regarding Lead Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/21/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
December 17, 2008 239 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 237 Regarding Deadline for Defendants to Respond to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
November 19, 2008 236 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 233 Regarding Deadline for Defendants to Respond to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
September 29, 2008 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion to Dismiss; granting 163 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 8, 2008 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte Taking 221 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the PSLRA Stay under Submission Without Oral Argument (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?