Sanchez v. City of San Jose et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv06331
Filed: October 10, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 176 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Christina Sanchez. Attorney Matthew Rutledge Schultz terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
January 21, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal re 174 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
December 8, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial Date re [104 in 5:06-cv-06331-JW] Stipulation. Consolidated Joint Pretrial Conference Statement and any additional in Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 1/4/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2010 11:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 2/16/2010 09:00AM. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2010 01:00 PM. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 3, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING TRIALS; SETTING NEW TRIAL DATES re 102 Case Management Statement. Consolidated Joint Pretrial Conference Statement and any additional in Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 12/11/2009. Final Pretrial Conference s et for 12/21/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 1/5/2010 09:00AM. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further trial specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 20, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR, DOCUMENT IS FILED IN WRONG CASE, PLEASE DISREGARD ***
January 6, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2009 is VACATED. The Court will set a new conference date in its Order addressing Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?