Cygnus Telecommunications Technology, LLC v. Majosa Communications Corp. et al
Case Number: 5:2006cv06479
Filed: October 18, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Whyte on 09/23/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/27/06. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2006)
October 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/26/06. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2006)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cygnus Telecommunications Technology, LLC v. Majosa Communications Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?