Jemery James Ehart, et al v. Ghillie Suits.Com, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv06507
Filed: October 18, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice re 146 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
January 25, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT re 144 Joint Case Management Statement. The parties shall file the appropriateStipulated Dismissal on or before 3/1/2010. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
November 12, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. On or before 12/14/2009, the parties shall exchange settlement documents within 30 days of this Order. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismissthis action. Stipulat ed Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 1/22/2010. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 16, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ABATE DEADLINES; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT re 138 Stipulation. Joint Status Statement due 11/6/2009. The Statement shall update the Court on the status of the parties' settlement efforts. Status Conference set for 11/16/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
August 11, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 135 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery due by 12/10/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2009. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 11/6/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Court will not entertain further requests to modify the Case Schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
May 15, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 127 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court stays all currently scheduled filing deadlines in the case for thirty (30) days to give New York Fire-Shield Inc. sufficient time to find substitute counsel. Ms. Coll ier shall remain as counsel of record for thirty (30) days for the purposes of receiving and providing legal documents until there is identification of substitute counsel. On or before June 15, 2009, Defendant shall file a Notice of Identification of Substitute Counsel. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. Counsel shall send a copy of this Order to Defendant and file the necessary certificate of service. The stay on all deadlines will be lifted on June 15, 2009.(jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009) Modified docket text on 5/16/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO DISCLOSE EXPERT WITNESSES AND COMPLETE DISCOVERY re 124 Stipulation. Close of Discovery due by 7/31/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 4, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 115 Motion for Settlement; granting 118 Motion to Dismiss; granting 119 Motion to Dismiss (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
January 23, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 23, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 9, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS DEFENDANTS, THE GARLAND COMPANY D/B/A FIRE SHIELD WEST AND GARY B. CROSSLAND Jace Contracting Services, Inc. aka Jace Contracting without prejudice and without costs re 112 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 16, 2008 110 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION AND TOLLING OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS re 107 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/16/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
September 24, 2008 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS FURTHER AMENDED BY THE COURT re 105 Stipulation filed by Gary B. Crossland. Close of ALL Discovery due by 6/15/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. In light of the age of the case, this is the parties' final continuance of the case schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/24/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jemery James Ehart, et al v. Ghillie Suits.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?