Dr. Robert Osdycke et al v. Maxtor Corporation

Case Number: 5:2006cv06634
Filed: October 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2011 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 20, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
January 27, 2011 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION 208 TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 27, 2011. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 26, 2011. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 25, 2011 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE FILING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 25, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
December 17, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 198 . Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/13/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 2, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURES, EXPERT REPORTS, AND EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF re 195 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/23/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 30, 2010 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/10/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 22, 2010 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on November 22, 2010.
November 17, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION 170 FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on November 17, 2010.
August 23, 2010 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 165 EXTENSION OF BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND EXTENSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT DATES. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
June 21, 2010 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 163 STIPULATED REQEUST FOR EXTENSION OF BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND EXTENSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT DATES. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/21/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 17, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 161 STIPULATED REQUEST REGARDING EXTENSION OF HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. The Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 is CONTINUED to 8/6/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/17/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
March 11, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 157 STIPULATED REQUEST REGARDING EXTENSION OF HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/8/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION REGARDING CONDUCT ON INSPECTION AND TESTING OF PLAINTIFFS' HARD DRIVES re 158 Stipulation, filed by Maxtor Corporation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 10, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
January 20, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 153 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
October 21, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL re 134 MOTION to Seal Document 132 MOTION to Shorten Time of Hearing Date re: Motion for an Order Compelling Distribution of Pioneer Notice and Production of Unredacted ESI Pursuant to the July 31 , 2009 Court Order, 133 MOTION to Compel Distrib MOTION to Seal Document 132 MOTION to Shorten Time of Hearing Date re: Motion for an Order Compelling Distribution of Pioneer Notice and Production of Unredacted ESI Pursuant to the July 31, 2009 Court Order, 133 MOTION to Compel Distrib MOTION to Seal Document 132 MOTION to Shorten Time of Hearing Date re: Motion for an Order Compelling Distribution of Pioneer Notice and Production of Unredacted ESI Pursuant to the July 31, 2009 Court Order, 133 MOTION to Compel Distrib filed by Thomas Traub, Brian Heisler, Jody Agerton, Rob Temple. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 21, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 8, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING JULY 31, 2009 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull finding as moot 114 Motion for Protective Order; finding as moot 119 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
September 1, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS FOR BRIAN HEISLER, ROB TEMPLE, THOMAS TRAUB, AND JODY AGERTON re 108 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/31/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 31, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH DISCOVERY ORDER re 110 Stipulation, filed by Maxtor Corporation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on August 31, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT MAXTOR'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 9, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SHORTENED BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON PARTIES' RESPECTIVE DISCOVERY MOTIONS re 70 Stipulation, filed by Maxtor Corporation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 9, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
April 21, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME TO HOLD CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 68 ). The Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2009 is CONTINUED to 8/14/2009. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/21/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. Robert Osdycke et al v. Maxtor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?