Dower et al v. Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire, LLC et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv06837
Filed: November 2, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2010 273 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal of Third Party Complaint With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(A)(ii)re 272 Stipulation. Motions terminated: 259 MOTION to Separate Trial, 260 MOTION for Separate Trial Phases. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 26, 2010 270 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Entry of Judgment as to Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC and Third Party Defendants Salinas Valley Solid Waste Authority, City of Salinas re 269 Stipulation. Salinas Valley Solid Waste Authority, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC and City of Salinas terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/26/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
August 4, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of COUNTERCLAIM by Waldo Simons against Bridgestone America's Inc., sued herein as BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS HOLDING, INC., and BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE OPERATIONS, LLC sued herein as BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC; re 250 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 10, 2009 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as Moot. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 10, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 11, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; NOMINATING TOM DENVER AS THE NEW SPECIAL MASTER; APPOINTING LESTER LEVY AS MEDIATOR. All future filings shall be filed in C 06-06837 JW and bear the caption: In re Bridgestone AmericasTire Operations Litigation. In addition , the Clerk shall administratively close C 08-05704 JW. Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Consolidated Complaint on or before June 25, 2009.The Court nominates Tom Denver of Mediation Masters to serve as the Special Master in this case. Any objections to this nomination shall be served and filed on or before June 18, 2009. If no objections are filed, the Court will issue a subsequent order to define the scope of Mr. Denver appointment. Lester Levy, previously the Special Master for all purposes, shall serve as a mediator to facilitate settlement. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified docket text on 6/11/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 235 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 233 Stipulation filed by Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire, LLC.That ALL plaintiff's claims against Defendant Bridgestone Americas Holding, Inc., NOW known as Bridgestone Americas, Inc., and those again st Defendants Does 1 through 100 are DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant Bridgestone/Firestone North Americas Tire, LLC has officially changed its name to Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. ***The Clerk shall make the appropriate modification on the docket.*** Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified docket text on 4/16/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/24/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2009 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of Plaintiff's Troy and Tina Graham re 221 Statement. Tina Graham and Troy Graham terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 18, 2009 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CLARIFY 219 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
February 24, 2009 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS RE: DETERMINATION OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS re 190 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/23/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
January 15, 2009 200 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Related cases: Create association to 5:08-cv-05704-JF. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
November 19, 2008 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 186 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
September 12, 2008 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting REMOVAL of Chung Han Lee. Chung Han Lee is NO longer with Holland & Knight LLP re 179 Notice of Change In Counsel. The Clerk shall remove him from the docket and proofs of service. **Attorney Chung-Han Lee terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/12/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
November 16, 2006 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Extenstion of Time to Reply or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaim. Plaintiff/Counterdefendants Shall File Reply to Counterclaim or Otherwise Respond to the Counterclaim Filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants is Extended by a Period of Th irty (30) Days. Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants shall file their Rely to Counterclaim or Otherwise Respond to the Counterclaim filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants by December 20, 2006 12 Stipulation filed by Vernon Dower, Miriam Dower, Andrew Dower, Lucas Dower, Gabriel Dower, Lesha Lelani Dower, Earline Rothermich, Lois Hija, Troy Graham, Tina Graham. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/16/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dower et al v. Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?