Crane v. Hatton et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv06910
Filed: November 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 85 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/3/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
September 23, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS; ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS re 55 , 56 , 68 and 70 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/22/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 9, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND OF SERVICE; ADDRESING PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/3/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crane v. Hatton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?