Christine Rios v. The City of San Jose et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv07036
Filed: November 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 18, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 42 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem and Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
October 9, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg re 32 , 33 Motions in Limine and Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to Designate an Expert Witness (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
February 8, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Stipulation filed by The City of San Jose. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/8/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christine Rios v. The City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?