Husain v. Khan

Case Number: 5:2006cv07081
Filed: November 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 152 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND GRANTING IN PART REQUEST FOR PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/16/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
July 29, 2010 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF INTENDED DECISION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/29/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
February 11, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANT'S USE OF DOCUMENTS PRODUCED ON JANUARY 15, 2010; AND RESETTING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/11/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
January 25, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 122 MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/25/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
November 24, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STUDENT APPLICATION TO APPEAR re 105 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/19/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
March 31, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment /Adjudication filed by Amjad Khan. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 31, 2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
December 12, 2008 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATES FROM JANUARY 9, 2009 TO FEBRUARY 13, 2009 (approving doc. no. 81 ). Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/12/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Husain v. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?