Noble v. Adams

Case Number: 5:2006cv07114
Filed: November 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 51 Motion to Stay Federal Proceedings Pending Further Exhaustion; granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016).
July 22, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
April 16, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 37 Motion to Lift Stay and Briefing on Remand. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
June 7, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER After Remand Re-Opening Case by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Matter is Referred to the Federal Public Defender's Office to Find Representation for Petitioner. All Further Proceedings in this Action are Stayed. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
October 15, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 21 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?