Chowdhury et al v. Siciliano et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv07132
Filed: November 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2009 FILE located at Federal Records Center (FRC), San Bruno, CA: Accession No: 021-2009-5152, Box No: 106. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
June 2, 2008 43 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay the Court's 41 May 13, 2008 re 42 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/2/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
May 16, 2008 42 STIPULATION to Stay the Court's 41 May 13, 2008 Order and [Proposed] Order. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 5/16/2008) Modified on 5/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2008 41 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
February 21, 2008 40 Featured Case ORDER Vacating Hearing on 2/25/2008 re 32 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court takes the matter under submission without oral argument. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/21/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
February 11, 2008 39 Declaration of Stacy Tolchin in Support of 38 Reply to Opposition filed byA.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (Related document(s) 38 ) (VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 38 Reply to 37 Opposition to motion for attorneys fees and costs filed byA.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to which document relates to) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
February 4, 2008 37 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Attorney's and costs Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act; Declaration of Mary Owens filed by Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano, David Still. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Declaration of Mary Owens)(Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 2/4/2008) Modified on 2/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2008 36 RE-NOTICE OF motion hearing re: 32 motion for attorneys fees and costs filed by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM. (VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 1/18/2008) Modified on 2/5/2008,(counsel used incorrect event, correct event is re-notice, not motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: pursuant to 35 Order Withdrawing Motion and Reseting Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2007)
December 4, 2007 35 Featured Case ORDER Withdrawing 32 Motion for Attorney Fees re 34 Stipulation. The hearing is rescheduled for 2/25/2008. Plaintiff's shall renotice their motion by 1/21/2008; Defendants' Opposition, if any, due by 2/4/2008; Plaintiffs' reply, if any, due 2/11/2008. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/4/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2007)
November 21, 2007 34 STIPULATION re 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees Rescheduling by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
October 17, 2007 33 Declaration of Stacy Tolchin in Support of 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byA.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (Related document(s) 32 ) (VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
October 17, 2007 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Awarding Fees)(VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 10/17/2007) Modified on 2/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2007 31 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal re 30 Stipulation filed by Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, David Still, Frank Siciliano, Alberto R. Gonzales. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/17/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2007)
September 14, 2007 30 STIPULATION to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order by Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano, David Still. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 9/14/2007)
August 29, 2007 29 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference from 9/17/2007 to 10/22/2007 re 28 Stipulation filed by Mumtaz Chowdhury, A.M. Rashed Chowdhury. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2007 10:00 AM Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/29/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 28, 2007 28 STIPULATION to Extend Answer date and CMC by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 1, 2007 27 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Time to Extend Answer Date re 26 Stipulation filed by Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, David Still, Frank Siciliano, Alberto R. Gonzales. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2007 10:00 AM Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/1/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
July 31, 2007 26 STIPULATION to Extend Answer Date; and [Proposed] Order by Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano, David Still. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
May 11, 2007 25 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuning Case Management Conference from 8/27/2007 to 9/17/2007. Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2007 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
March 9, 2007 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 4/2/2007 TO 8/27/2007 WITH TIME MODIFCIATION FROM 1:30 PM TO 10:00 AM. Parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference by 8/17/2007 re 23 Stipulation filed by David Still, Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2007 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/9/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 8, 2007 23 STIPULATION to Extend Dates; and [Proposed] Order by Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano, David Still. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
February 14, 2007 22 CLERK'S NOTICE re 21 Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2007 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 13, 2007 21 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATES WITH MODIFICATIONS re 20 Stipulation filed by David Still, Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano. Case Management Conference Statement Due 3/23/2007. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2007 10:00 AM. Please see Order for Date Modifications. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/13/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2007)
February 12, 2007 20 STIPULATION to Extend Dates; and [Proposed] Order by Christine Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano, David Still. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
January 17, 2007 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH THE DEFENDANTS MUST FILE AN ANSWER re 18 Stipulation filed by David Still, Christina Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/17/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2007)
January 16, 2007 18 STIPULATION To Extend Time Within Which the Defendants Must File an Answer; and [Proposed] Order by Christina Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano, David Still. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 3, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 16 MOTION to Withdraw 14 Order Set Deadlines/Hearings 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Withdrawal of Motion for PI filed by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2007 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/3/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2007)
January 2, 2007 16 MOTION to Withdraw 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2007 09:00 AM. (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 1/2/2007) Modified on 1/3/2007, link to motion (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2006 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ila Casy Deiss (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 12/4/2006)
December 1, 2006 14 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' THIRD STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEUDLE AND HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION re 13 . Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/8/2007 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/01/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2006 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/1/2006 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2006 13 **** PLEASE REFER TO DOCKET ITEM 14 FOR ORDER ***** STIPULATION re Set/Reset Hearings, Set/Reset Deadlines withdrawing 12/4/06 hearing by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 11/30/2006) Modified on 12/1/2006 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2006 12 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PARITES' SECOND STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION re 11 Stipulation filed by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/29/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2006)
November 28, 2006 11 STIPULATION Parties' Second Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Motion by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 11/28/2006)
November 22, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
November 22, 2006 10 ******************* FILED IN ERROR MOTION HEARING SET FOR 12/4/2006 @ 9:00 AM PLEASE SEE DOCKET ITEM 9 *********************************CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006) Modified on 11/22/2006 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2006 9 Featured Case ******************AMENDED DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION. MOTION SET FOR 12/4/2006 @ 9:00 AM ************ORDER GRANTING WITH MODIFICATIONS PLAINTIFFS Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Motion re 7 Proposed Order filed by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/22/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2006 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/22/2006 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2006 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File the Notice of Motion and Motion for preliminary injunction and supporting documents and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
November 17, 2006 8 Proposed Order granting plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2006 7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order regarding briefing schedule and hearing on Preliminary Injunction motion. by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2006 5 Declaration of Stacy Tolchin in Support of 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byA.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (Related document(s) 4 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2006 4 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by A.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2006 Summons Issued as to Christina Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano, David Still, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 3 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2007. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/06. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 2 Stipulation and Proposed Order the parties stipulate that dismissal of the original petition for writ of mandamus case number C06-7032 SC was appropriate, that refiling of the petition in the San Jose Division is appropriate, that NO motion to consider whether cases should be related is necessary AND THIS case should NOT BE transferred to San Francisco.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2006 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT (summons issued) against Christina Poulos, Michael Chertoff, Alberto R. Gonzales, Frank Siciliano, David Still ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 3392565.). Filed byA.M. Rashed Chowdhury, Mumtaz Chowdhury. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/20/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chowdhury et al v. Siciliano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?