Tyco Thermal Controls, LLC v. Redwood Industrials et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv07164
Filed: November 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 564 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 562 MOTION to Shorten Time. Responses due by 4/29/2013. Replies due by 5/3/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2013 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/19/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 31, 2013 557 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/31/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2013)
January 16, 2013 507 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (504 in 3:06-cv-07164-NC) and (163 in 3:10-cv-01606-NC) Joint Trial Stipulations. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/16/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 14, 2013 496 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 494 Request for Use of Electronic Equipment at Trial. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/14/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 7, 2013 490 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Further Trial Preparation. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/07/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
September 25, 2012 481 Opinion or Order of the Court TENATIVE RULINGS RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE 446 , 448 , 456 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 09/25/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
July 9, 2012 434 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying (398) Motion in Limine; denying (399) Motion in Limine; denying (400) Motion in Limine; denying (431) Motion in Limine in case 4:06-cv-07164-SBA; denying (101) Motion in Limine; denying (104) Motion in Limine; denying (105) Motion in Limine; denying (125) Motion in Limine in case 4:10-cv-01606-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 2, 2012 430 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Further Settlement Conference set for 7/10/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/2/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
February 27, 2012 412 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/27/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
January 27, 2012 379 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (67 in 4:10-cv-01606-SBA, 67 in 4:10-cv-01606-SBA, 356 in 4:06-cv-07164-SBA, 356 in 4:06-cv-07164-SBA) Case Management Scheduling Order,, Set Trial Management Order Deadlines, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2012 01:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 3/12/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Jury Trial set for 3/12/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 26, 2012 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 375 Supplemental Exchanged Settlement Conference Statement filed by Tyco Thermal Controls, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/26/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
December 6, 2011 371 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/13/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 29, 2011 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: That the law firm of Dongell Lawrence Finney LLP will substitute as counsel of record for Plaintiff Tyco Thermal Controls, LLC. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/29/11. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 6, 2011 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 349 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 19, 2011 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 311 , 323 , 324 CROSS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/19/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
July 5, 2011 330 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR TYCO'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND HEARING DATE re (328 in 5:06-cv-07164-JF), (328 in 5:06-cv-07164-JF) Stipulation, (311 in 5:06-cv-07164-JF) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion a nd Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof), (324 in 5:06-cv-07164-JF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on RCR A, (323 in 5:06-cv-07164-JF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on CERCLA. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/20/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
May 18, 2011 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 313 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on May 16, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 310 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 309 Stipulation filed by Tyco Thermal Controls, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 18, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
January 21, 2011 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING PENDING MOTIONS; RE-OPENING DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES; AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 21, 2011.
January 5, 2011 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
September 20, 2010 241 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS re 239 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/13/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 1, 2010 237 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 9/10/10 re 236 , (20 in 5:10-cv-01606-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/1/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 17, 2010 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL RE 72 TYCO'S PENDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 12, 2010 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING (184) (190) MOTIONS FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND (6) TO DISMISS. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 21, 2010 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL 225 GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO DEFER RULING ON THE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO FILE ADDITIONAL BRIEFING OR EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge JEREMY FOGEL on 7/21/2010. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
June 28, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge JEREMY FOGEL on 6/28/2010. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 22, 2010 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 210 ROWE'S REQUEST TO FILE AN UNCONDITIONAL OPPOSITION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/22/2010. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 9, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TYCO'S MOTION TO PROPOUND ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY re 186 MOTION additional discovery re 180 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Continue MOTION additional discovery re 180 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Continue filed by Tyco Thermal Controls, LLC. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 8, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
April 26, 2010 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 181 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES.(jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 15, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL RE 104 105 125 132 144 164 167 PENDING MOTIONS. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
December 14, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 82 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
November 13, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO TAKE DEPOSITION re 91 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/12/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 12, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 86 ROWE INDUSTRIES, INC.'S MOTION TO CHANGE TIME OF HEARING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUBSEQUENTLY FILED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/12/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 28, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 80 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO TAKE DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 5, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO TAKE CERTAIN DEPOSITIONS re 70 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/5/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
August 19, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' Renewed Request to Be Excused from Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 8/19/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 17, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Rowe Industries' Request to Be Excused from Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 8/17/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
May 14, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 for Joint Discovery Plan, Mediation Schedule, and Further Extension of Pretrial and Trial Dates. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2010 01:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/11/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
April 3, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 Joint Discovery Plan, Mediation Schedule, Extension of Pretrial and Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/31/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 57 Substitution of Attorneys. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/26/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyco Thermal Controls, LLC v. Redwood Industrials et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?