Abbott Laboratories et al v. Agamatrix, Inc.

Case Number: 5:2006cv07268
Filed: November 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 163 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/5/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 17, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 159 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2011 is CONTINUED to 4/1/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/17/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
January 5, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 157 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2011 is CONTINUED to 3/18/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
November 4, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 155 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2010 is CONTINUED to 1/7/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 28, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL re 153 Stipulation,, filed by Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 14, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 151 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [AS MODIFIED]. The Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2010 is CONTINUED to 11/12/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 12, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 149 Granting Second Request to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compell. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/12/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 27, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 145 Stipulated Request to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/27/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 20, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL re 140 Stipulation filed by Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on September 20, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
August 19, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 124 Regarding Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/10/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 13, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 128 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SUBMISSIONS UNDER LOCAL RULE 6-2. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
April 21, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 103 JOINT MOTION TO VACATE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
March 25, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/23/2010 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/25/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
October 6, 2008 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 93 AGREED MOTION to Stay Case Pending Outcome of Appeals. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/2/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 18, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 90 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. and Abbott Laboratories' Request to Allow Lead Counsel to Participate in Case Management Conference by Telephone. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/18/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 12, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 88 Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/12/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott Laboratories et al v. Agamatrix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?