Bob Lewis Volkswagen v. Universal Underwriters Insurance Company

Case Number: 5:2006cv07332
Filed: November 28, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 47 for Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/7/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
February 25, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 45 to Continue Case Management Conference Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/25/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
December 17, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 43 Re: Notice of Status of Settlement and Continuance of Case Management Conference : Dismissal to be Filed by 2/20/2009 or Appear for a Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2009 10:30 AM Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 4, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 41 Regarding Hearing Date: Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2008 10:30 AM or Parties File a Dismissal by 12/15/2008. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/4/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
October 10, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 35 Stipulation filed by Universal Underwriters Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 10, 2008. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bob Lewis Volkswagen v. Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?