Zazzle.com, Inc. v. Abbie Road Imprinting, LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: Zazzle.com, Inc.
Defendant: Abbie Road Imprinting, LLC
Case Number: 5:2006cv07429
Filed: December 5, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2007 6
NOTICE by Zazzle.com, Inc. OF DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF (Valentine, Andrew) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
December 29, 2006 5
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zazzle.com, Inc.. Abbie Road Imprinting, LLC served on 12/11/2006, answer due 1/2/2007. (Valentine, Andrew) (Filed on 12/29/2006)
December 21, 2006 4
Certificate of Interested Entities OR PARTIES OF PLAINTIFF ZAZZLE.COM, INC. (Valentine, Andrew) (Filed on 12/21/2006)
December 7, 2006 3
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zazzle.com, Inc. v. Abbie Road Imprinting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zazzle.com, Inc.
Represented By: George C. Limbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbie Road Imprinting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?