Guess v. US Bancorp et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv07535
Filed: December 8, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION RE JOINDER OF ADDITIONAL PARTIES; REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/31/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
December 15, 2008 148 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (approving doc. no. 147 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/15/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 21, 2008 146 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 12/22/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/21/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 3, 2008 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 128 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/3/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 6, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 125 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/2/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 19, 2008 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 123 Stipulation filed by US Bancorp Investments, U.S. Bank, US Bancorp, U.S. Bank N.A.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 8, 2008 122 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 121 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/4/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guess v. US Bancorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?