In re FINISAR CORP. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION

Case Number: 5:2006cv07660
Filed: December 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 224 Approving Derivative Settlement and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/18/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
August 15, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 206 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. This order replaces 214 by fixing an error in the initial drafting related to one of the firms listed as counsel. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/15/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
April 17, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 203 Vacating Deadlines and Setting Schedule for Filing of Preliminary Approval Papers. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/17/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
March 18, 2013 202 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 201 Further Extending Deadlines for (I) Amending Answers to the Complaint; and (II) Filing Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/18/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
January 29, 2013 200 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 199 Further Extending Deadlines for (i) Amending Answers to the Complaint; and (ii) Filing Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 2, 2013 198 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 193 Extending Deadlines for (i) Amending Answers to the Complaint; and (ii) Filing Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/2/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
September 5, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 179 Regarding Substitution of the Mitchell Family Revocable Trust, Larry Mitchell Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/5/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
July 12, 2012 173 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR FILING A MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION PURSUANT TO RULE 25(a) (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
June 6, 2012 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 159 Granting Substitution of Counsel for Officer Defendants David Buse, John Drury, Mark Farley, Jan Lipson, Stephen Workman & Joseph Young. Attorney Jeremy T Kamras; Jaime Marie Huling Delaye Terminated From the Case. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/6/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 5, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 166 Continuig 6/8/2012 Hearing on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss. Motion Hearing is reset to 6/29/2012 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/5/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
April 17, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 153 Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Supplemental Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/17/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
March 28, 2012 152 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 140 Extending the Deadline for Filing a Motion for Substitution. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/28/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
February 24, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY STAY. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on February 24, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
November 30, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 121 Granting Substitution of Counsel for Defendants David Buse, John Drury, Mark Farley and Joseph Young. Attorney Jeremy T Kamras, Jaime Marie Huling Delaye for David Buse, Jeremy T Kamras, Jaime Marie Huling Delaye for John Drury, Jeremy T Kamras, Jaime Marie Huling Delaye for Mark J. Farley, Jeremy T Kamras, Jaime Marie Huling Delaye for Joseph A. Young added. Attorney David Allen Priebe and Shirli Fabbri Weiss terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/30/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 29, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 127 Extending the Deadline for Filing a Motion for Substitution. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/29/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 9, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 125 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/9/2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
September 16, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 111 Granting Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Stephen K. Workman. Attorney David Allen Priebe and Shirli Fabbri Weiss terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/16/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 8, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 115 Continuing Case Management Conference for One Week: Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/8/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 30, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 112 Request for Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/30/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
September 22, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 09/22/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
October 21, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/21/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
February 6, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 51 Revising Briefing Schedule for Second Amended Consolidated Complaint and Defendants' Response Thereto. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/6/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re FINISAR CORP. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?