McIntosh et al v. McAfee, et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv07694
Filed: December 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 112 Letter, 113 Proposed Order, 111 Order on Report and Recommendations. McAfee shall make the designated payments within 30 calenda r days of the entry of this Order. Pursuant to the Court's October 17, 2008 Order, this action is ordered dismissed. TheClerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 13, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009) Modified docket text on 4/1/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 96 Report and Recommendations. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
January 27, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/27/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
December 16, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 96 MOTION for REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Attorneys Fees and Costs to plaintiffs. filed by Ping Chen, Vatsal Sonecha, Steve Haeffele, Jonathan Wong, Larry McIntosh, Lebin Cheng, Yangie Cheng. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/16/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntosh et al v. McAfee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?