Microsoft Corporation v. Ronald Alepin Morrison & Foerster et al Featured Case

Microsoft Corporation sought an authorization to serve subpoenas to International Business Machines Corporation, Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP and Maurits Dolmans regarding communications or correspondence between the parties and the European Commission relating to interoperability information.

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: Ronald Alepin, Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP and Jeffrey Kingston, Oracle Corporation, Sun Microsystems, Inc., Daniel Harris, Ronald Alepin Morrison & Foerster and Clifford Chance LLP and Daniel Harris
Intervenor: The Commission of the European Communities
Case Number: 5:2006mc80038
Filed: March 3, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2006 67 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING THE REQUEST OF DOUGLAS MELAMED TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/27/06. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
April 20, 2006 65
NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 40 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, 42 MOTION De Novo Review and Supplement The Record re 40 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court of Withdrawal of Objections to Magistrate's Order and of Motion for De Novo Review and to Expand The Record (Wolson, Joshua) (Filed on 4/20/2006)
April 18, 2006 64
Proposed Order re 63 Response ( Non Motion ) Granting Oracle Corporation, Clifford Chance LLP, Daniel Harris and Ronald Alepin's Motion to Further Augment the Record by Ronald Alepin, Clifford Chance LLP and Daniel Harris, Oracle Corporation. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 4/18/2006)
April 17, 2006 63
RESPONSE to Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Expand the Record by Ronald Alepin Morrison & Foerster, Clifford Chance LLP and Daniel Harris, Oracle Corporation. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 5, 2006 44
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by James N. Penrod NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (Penrod, James) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
March 29, 2006 38 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 16 17 Motions to Quash Subpoenas and Vacating Prior Order. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/29/2006)
March 27, 2006 35
Minute Entry:Motion Hearing held on 3/27/2006 before Patricia V. Trumbull (Date Filed: 3/27/2006). (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (cm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2006)
March 16, 2006 30
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Microsoft Corporation of Civil Subpoena to Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP (Jones, Richard) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 15, 2006 24
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP and Jeffrey Kingston, Sun Microsystems, Inc. Proof Service (Webb, Diane) (Filed on 3/15/2006)
March 13, 2006 14
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP and Jeffrey Kingston, Sun Microsystems, Inc. (Webb, Diane) (Filed on 3/13/2006)
March 10, 2006 9
STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO OBJECT AND TO FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM by Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP and Jeffrey Kingston. (Webb, Diane) (Filed on 3/10/2006)
March 6, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re [1] Ex Parte Application for Order Allowing Discovery; and Setting Deadlines for Objections and Motions to Quash. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/6/06. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/6/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Ronald Alepin Morrison & Foerster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Alepin
Represented By: Christopher St. John Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP and Jeffrey Kingston
Represented By: James Norman Penrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Christopher St. John Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: James Norman Penrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Harris
Represented By: Christopher St. John Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Alepin Morrison & Foerster
Represented By: Christopher St. John Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Chance LLP and Daniel Harris
Represented By: Christopher St. John Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Commission of the European Communities
Represented By: Elizabeth I. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: E. Edward Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?