Acero v. County of Santa Clara et al

Plaintiff: Longino Acero, Jr.
Defendant: Lyn Agre, Thomas Spielbauer, Thomas Sharkey, Stefany Glass, Ronald Knapel, Michelle Diederichs, J. J. Kapp, County of Santa Clara and Roderic O'Connor
Case Number: 5:2007cv00029
Filed: January 4, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE as to all named defendants re 89 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 10, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 86 Pretrial Memorandum filed by Longino Acero, Jr. The Court continues the 9/14/2009 Pretrial Conference to 10/5/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall file a joint preliminary pretrial conference statement by 9/25/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
August 4, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CONTINUATION OF DEADLINES; CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIALCONFERENCE re 82 Stipulation. The Court DENIES the parties' Stipulation to continue existing Case Schedule for four months since the Court has previously granted the parti es' multiple extensions. The Court finds good cause to continue the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently set for August 31, 2009. The parties shall comply with the schedule as follows: Close of All Discovery due by 9/21/2009. Last Date to H ear Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due 9/4/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
May 13, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER re 79 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery due by 9/21/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 8/21/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. All other aspects of the September 17, 2008, order remain the same. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acero v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyn Agre
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Spielbauer
Represented By: James Earl Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sharkey
Represented By: Ann Miller Ravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefany Glass
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Knapel
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Diederichs
Represented By: Ann Miller Ravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. J. Kapp
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Ann Miller Ravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderic O'Connor
Represented By: Ann Miller Ravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longino Acero, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?