2M Group, Inc. v. Solstice Management, LLC

Plaintiff: 2M Group, Inc.
Defendant: Solstice Management, LLC
Counter-claimant: Solstice Management, LLC
Counter-defendant: 2M Group, Inc.
Mediator: Ellen J. Beilock
Case Number: 5:2007cv00136
Filed: January 9, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued against Solstice Management, LLC (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/23/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 22, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 34 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; DENYING 38 MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD; GRANTING 43 MOTION TO ADD MICHAEL KOSKIE AND MEG GOODMAN AS PLAINTIFFS. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 16, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 34 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; DENYING 43 Ex Parte Application To Shorten Time To Hear Motion To Add Michael Koskie and Meg Goodman as Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/16/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2M Group, Inc. v. Solstice Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solstice Management, LLC
Represented By: Derek Scott Lemkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2M Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Allen Brackey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Solstice Management, LLC
Represented By: Derek Scott Lemkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: 2M Group, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Scott Lemkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Ellen J. Beilock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?