Blennis et al v. Helett-Packard Company

Plaintiff: David Brickner and Jackie Blennis
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 5:2007cv00333
Filed: January 17, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
July 15, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 58 THE JOINT STIPULATION RE PROPOSED PLAN FOR FILING SETTLEMENT PAPERS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 11, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 56 THE JOINT STIPULATION RE PROPOSED PLAN FOR FILING SETTLEMENT PAPERS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
April 26, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 54 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PROPOSED PLAN FOR FILING SETTLEMENT PAPERS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/26/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
March 12, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 52 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING FURTHER MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. The Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2010 is CONTINUED to 7/9/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
January 20, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 50 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING FURTHER MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. The Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 is CONTINUED to 5/21/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/19/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 4, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 48 Stipulation filed by Jackie Blennis, David Brickner, STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulation filed by Jackie Blennis, David Brickner. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on January 4, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
September 14, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (WITH MODIFICATION) 44 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
February 8, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE ADR SESSION re 34 Stipulation filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/7/08. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blennis et al v. Helett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brickner
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Blennis
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Michael Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?