MK Ballistics Systems et al v. Simpson et al

Plaintiff: MK Ballistics Systems and Michael Keith
Defendant: William Simpson, John Sarsfield and County of San Benito
Case Number: 5:2007cv00688
Filed: February 2, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 01/08/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
November 13, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A REPLY. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/08/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 22, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/22/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MK Ballistics Systems et al v. Simpson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Simpson
Represented By: Nancy M. Battel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sarsfield
Represented By: Christian Bayard Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Benito
Represented By: Stephan A. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MK Ballistics Systems
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Keith
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?