Licking Enterprises, Inc. v. City of San Jose et al

Plaintiff: Licking Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: City of San Jose, John DiQuisto, Linda J. Le Zotte, Pat Dando, Ken Yeager, Nora Campos, George Shirakawa, Jr., David D. Cortese, Forrest Williams, Cindy Chavez, Chuck Reed, San Jose City Council and Ron Gonzales
Mediator: Jerry Y. Fong
Case Number: 5:2007cv00735
Filed: February 5, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 44 Dismissing Entire Action With Prejudice, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/18/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
September 22, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 25 Granting Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff Licking Enterprises, Inc., Attorney Stuart D. Kirchick terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/22/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
December 23, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 22 , 23 for Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/23/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
August 26, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 20 to Vacate Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates:Case Management Conference Re: Settlement set for 10/30/2009 10:30 AM. If Settlement is Final, Dismissal on File by 10/23/2009. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/26/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
April 9, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 18 Continuing Pretrial and Trial Date: Jury Trial set for 9/14/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/9/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Licking Enterprises, Inc. v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John DiQuisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda J. Le Zotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Dando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Shirakawa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D. Cortese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Licking Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jivaka Candappa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Jerry Y. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?