New Amsterdam Project Management Humanitarian Foundation v. Laughrin et al

Plaintiff: New Amsterdam Project Management Humanitarian Foundation
Defendant: Kelly Laughrin and Campbell, Warburton, Fitzsimmons, Smith, Mendell & Pastore
Case Number: 5:2007cv00935
Filed: February 14, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 111 MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND GRANTING 94 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed on 5/29/09 by Judge Jeremy Fogel.(jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
April 23, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMOVING STEPHEN C. JOHNSON, HEATHER M. NOELTE AND DEMPSEY & JOHNSON P.C. FROM THE ECF REGISTRY IN THE INSTANT ACTION re 101 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/22/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
January 14, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Discovery (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
October 31, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 Notice (Other) filed by Campbell, Warburton, Fitzsimmons, Smith, Mendell & Pastore, Kelly Laughrin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/31/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 21, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Reconsideration re 73 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order,,, OF THE COURT'S THIRD INTERIM ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COM PEL DISCOVERYEmergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order,,, OF THE COURT'S THIRD INTERIM ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY filed by New Amsterdam Project Management Humanitarian Foundation (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 15, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD INTERIM ORDER re 31 MOTION for Discovery To Compel Further Responses filed by New Amsterdam Project Management Humanitarian Foundation, 29 MOTION for Discovery To Compel Further Responses filed by New Amsterdam Project Managem ent Humanitarian Foundation, 30 MOTION for Discovery To Compel Further Responses filed by New Amsterdam Project Management Humanitarian Foundation, 32 MOTION for Discovery To Compel Further Responses filed by New Amsterdam Project M anagement Humanitarian Foundation, 33 MOTION for Discovery To Compel Further Responses filed by New Amsterdam Project Management Humanitarian Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/14/08. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 3, 2008 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 68 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/3/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Amsterdam Project Management Humanitarian Foundation v. Laughrin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Amsterdam Project Management Humanitarian Foundation
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Laughrin
Represented By: Richard Martin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell, Warburton, Fitzsimmons, Smith, Mendell & Pastore
Represented By: Richard Martin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?