Lee v. Ambroseo et al

Plaintiff: James M. Lee, Michael Werner and J. Davis Bartholomew
Defendant: Helene Simonet, Bernard J. Couillaud, John R. Ambroseo, Luis Spinelli, Vittorio Fossati-Bellani, Ronald A. Victor, Paul L. Meissner, Scott H. Miller, Dennis C. Bucek, Charles W. Cantoni, Sandeep Vij, John H. Hart, Lawrence Tomlinson, Robert J. Quillinan, Garry W. Rogerson, Coherent, Inc., James L. Hobart, Henry E Gauthier, Robert M Gelber, Kevin P Connors, Gerald C Barker, James L. Taylor and Kevin McCarthy
Case Number: 5:2007cv00955
Filed: February 15, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE (granting 144 ). Final Approval Hearing set for 11/9/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
March 12, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (granting 136 as modified). The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2009 are CONTINUED to 3/23/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/12/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
January 14, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC (approving document no. 130 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 5, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving document no. 118 ). Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 1/30/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 10, 2008 117 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 115 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/4/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
September 30, 2008 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/30/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 26, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (approving docket no. 112 ). The Case Management Conference set for 11/7/08 is CONTINUED to 1/9/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/26/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
February 5, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re 77 Stipulation filed by Coherent, Inc., Coherent, Inc. Special Litigation Committee. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/5/08. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Ambroseo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helene Simonet
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard J. Couillaud
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Ambroseo
Represented By: Caz Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Spinelli
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vittorio Fossati-Bellani
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Victor
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Meissner
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott H. Miller
Represented By: Charles Ralph Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis C. Bucek
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Cantoni
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandeep Vij
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Hart
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Tomlinson
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Quillinan
Represented By: Stephen E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry W. Rogerson
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coherent, Inc.
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Hobart
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry E Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Gelber
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P Connors
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald C Barker
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Taylor
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCarthy
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Lee
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Werner
Represented By: Alan Roth Plutzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Davis Bartholomew
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Herkenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?