Mendez et al v. Balli et al

Plaintiff: Fernando Castro, Fernando Duran, Michael Havens, Rudy Olivares, Ruben Mendez, Reyes Acevedo, Jr., Raymond J. Balli, Robert Cadena, Derek Overkamp, Albert Porras, Richard A. Souza and Olsen Talalele
Defendant: Bottomley Distributing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv01086
Filed: February 22, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT (approving 76 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/15/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
April 29, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 74 REQUEST TO EXTEND PERIOD FOR CONSIDERATION TO BE PAID. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/29/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
January 26, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/26/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
November 3, 2008 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 67 REQUEST FOR COURTCALL TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/3/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez et al v. Balli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Castro
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Duran
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Havens
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Olivares
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Mendez
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyes Acevedo, Jr.
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond J. Balli
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cadena
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Overkamp
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Porras
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Souza
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olsen Talalele
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bottomley Distributing Co., Inc.
Represented By: George Joseph Tichy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?