Garvin et al v. Ramirez et al

Plaintiff: Rafael Bravo, Tomas Hernandez, Martha Hernandez, Maria A Garvin, Juan Ramirez, Columba Ramos, Maria C. Ramirez, Eugenio Ramos, Jesus Arreola, Antonio Arreola, Prospero Torralba, Cirila Torralba, Raul Gonzalez and Raul Torres
Defendant: Linda Tran, Absolute Investment Group, Inc., Norma Valdovinos, Raya Ghajar, Pablo Curiel, Paul Curiel, Paul Curiel Insurance Agency, Palacio Real Funding, Inc., Golden Hills Associates, Inc. and Tara Home Financial Services, Inc.
Cross-claimant: Pablo Curiel
Cross-defendant: Tara Home Financial Services, Inc., Linda Tran, Absolute Investment Group, Inc., Norma Valdovinos, Raya Ghajar and Palacio Real Funding, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv01571
Filed: March 20, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING RAUL GONZALEZ'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT 325 , and JUDGMENT in favor of Raul Torres against Golden Hills Associates, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/16/11. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
September 6, 2011 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendant and Cross-Claimant Pablo Curiel's Cross-Claims. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/6/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
July 15, 2011 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Vacating Status Conference and (2) Setting Show Cause Hearing re Failure to Prosecute. 7/19/2011 status conference is vacated. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2011 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/14/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
May 10, 2011 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. See order for details. Status Conference set for 7/19/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/10/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 4, 2011 265 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and Entry of Judgment as to Defendant Raya Ghajar re 263 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/4/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
March 22, 2011 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DENYING 236 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication and (2) STRIKING Defendant Jesus Chavez's Opposition thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/22/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 8, 2011 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 228 Plaintiffs' Motion for Adverse Inferences against Defendant Jesus Chavez. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/8/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 10, 2011 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 233 Defendant's Request to Substitute Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/10/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
December 13, 2010 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DISCHARGING 217 Order to Show Cause and (2) GRANTING 211 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Jesus Chavez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/13/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 3, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 203 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions against Defendant Golden Hills Associates, Inc. and STRIKING Its Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/3/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
July 29, 2010 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 188 Last & Faoro's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for determination without oral argument, and the August 3, 2010 hearing is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 07/29/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 10, 2010 185 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICIA V. TRUMBULL re 184 Stipulation, filed by Prospero Torralba, Maria A Garvin, Martha Hernandez, Raul Gonzalez, Tomas Hernandez, Raul Torres, Rafael Bravo, Eugenio Ramos, Cirila Torralba, Juan Ramirez, Maria C. Ramirez, Jesus Arreola, Columba Ramos, Antonio Arreola. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 10, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 7, 2010 178 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 176 TO CONSENT TO PROCEED FOR ALL PURPOSES WITH SAN JOSE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOWARD R. LLOYD. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
October 5, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 138 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/05/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
May 8, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
December 4, 2008 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/4/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garvin et al v. Ramirez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Bravo
Represented By: William J. Goines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Hernandez
Represented By: Stephanie Sidra Alexandre Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Hernandez
Represented By: William J. Goines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria A Garvin
Represented By: Stephanie Sidra Alexandre Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramirez
Represented By: Alisha Mei Yuk Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columba Ramos
Represented By: Karen Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria C. Ramirez
Represented By: Stephanie Sidra Alexandre Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Ramos
Represented By: Stephanie Sidra Alexandre Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Arreola
Represented By: Stephanie Sidra Alexandre Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Arreola
Represented By: Stephanie Sidra Alexandre Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospero Torralba
Represented By: Stephanie Sidra Alexandre Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirila Torralba
Represented By: Stephanie Sidra Alexandre Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Gonzalez
Represented By: Mona Motwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Torres
Represented By: Mona Motwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Tran
Represented By: Shawn Robert Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Robert Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Valdovinos
Represented By: Shawn Robert Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raya Ghajar
Represented By: Joseph Loyola Naegele, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Curiel
Represented By: Michael E. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Curiel
Represented By: Amiel Lee Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Curiel Insurance Agency
Represented By: Amiel Lee Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palacio Real Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Hills Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Robert Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Home Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Loyola Naegele, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-claimant: Pablo Curiel
Represented By: Michael E. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Tara Home Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Loyola Naegele, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Linda Tran
Represented By: Shawn Robert Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Absolute Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Robert Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Norma Valdovinos
Represented By: Shawn Robert Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Raya Ghajar
Represented By: Joseph Loyola Naegele, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Palacio Real Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?