Agha v. Jacobs et al

Plaintiff: Nader T. Agha
Defendant: Oliver Jacobs, Martin Padisak and I.E.S.
Case Number: 5:2007cv01800
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 09/28/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
July 2, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/2/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 1, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 51 DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/1/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agha v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nader T. Agha
Represented By: Robert Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Padisak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.E.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?