West v. Jewelry Innovations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Trent West
Defendant: Jewelry Innovations, Inc., Tosyali International, Inc., Diamond Northstar, Inc., A Jamais Designs, Inc. and Crown Ring, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Jewelry Innovations, Inc., Northstar Diamond, Inc., Tosyali International, Inc. and Crown Ring, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Trent West
Case Number: 5:2007cv01812
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER RELATING CASES re (95 in 5:09-cv-01303-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 389 STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN WEST AND CROWN RING, INC.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/16/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER ENTERING PERMANENT INJUNCTION ENJOINING INFRINGEMENT BY CROWN RING, INC. (granting 385 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/15/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 325 Motion for Default Judgment (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 244 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 252 Motion to Shift Burden of Proof; denying 263 Motion for Summary Judgment (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 321 Selecting ADR Process, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/23/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 193 defendant Crown Ring's Motion to Compel; denying 197 defendant Crown Ring's Motion for Sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER GRANTING re 259 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/3/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Invalidity Contentions (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 231 Motion to Shorten Time as Moot (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER APPROVING 235 JOINT STIPULATION MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/26/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER APPROVING 225 STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF TRENT WEST AND DEFENDANT CROWN RING, INC. TO PERMIT ENTRY OF CROWN RING, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED PRELIMINARY INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS FOR GOOD CAUSE UNDER PATENT L.R. 3-7. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/14/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 221 Dismissal With Prejudice Between West and Benchmark. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 216 Between West and Crown Ring to Permit Entry of West's First Amended Infringement Contentions as to Crown Ring For Good Cause Under Patent L.R. 3-7. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/29/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 187 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PRELIMINARY INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 203 to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/2/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING re 186 Withdrawal. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/24/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Jewelry Innovations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewelry Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Brent T. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosyali International, Inc.
Represented By: Brent T. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Northstar, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Ficenec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Jamais Designs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Ring, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Trojan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent West
Represented By: Edward Vincent King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Jewelry Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Marc N. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Northstar Diamond, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Tosyali International, Inc.
Represented By: Brett D. Ekins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Crown Ring, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Trojan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Trent West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?