Carillo v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Tamiko Carillo
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance and Allied Insurance
Case Number: 5:2007cv01979
Filed: April 9, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/7/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 2, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 108 111 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas to Dr. Bruce Eliashof and Barbara Krzyczkowska and/or for Protective Order (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 28, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 103 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/28/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
August 13, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 106 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
July 2, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 76 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 18, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 89 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/18/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
December 16, 2008 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 Changing Time. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/15/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
September 5, 2008 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME; ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/5/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carillo v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: George Edward Rudloff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamiko Carillo
Represented By: Wesley Martin Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?