Garza et al v. Mission Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: Enrike Garza and Rafael Guerrero
Defendant: Mission Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv02092
Filed: April 13, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 16, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
June 15, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GRUMA CORPORATION'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS re 93 Status Report filed by Mission Foods, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 15, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
February 4, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 46 Stipulation. The Court finds good cause to provide a brief extension of the current case schedule. However, because this case has been pending since 2006, the Court willonly grant the parties a 3 0 day extension. The parties shall work in good faith to bring this case to a close within the time frame as provided: Mediation hearing set for 3/18/2009. Close of All Discovery due by 5/11/2009. Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motions by 6/29/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 4/10/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/2009. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
October 24, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 44 Stipulation filed by Mission Foods, Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/24/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza et al v. Mission Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrike Garza
Represented By: Stanley G. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Guerrero
Represented By: Stanley G. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Mitchell Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?