Wu v. Stitt et al

Plaintiff: Yenna Wu, Frank A. Grucel, Jr. and Linda Erikson
Defendant: Christopher Todd, Harold L. Covert, Darrell Scherbarth, Gordon L Stitt, Herb Schneider, Stephen Haddock, Paul Romeo, Vito E. Palermo, Alexander Gray, Frank C. Carlucci, William R. Slakey, Charles Carinalli, Harry Silverglide, Michael West, Kenneth Levy, Robert L. Corey, Peter Wolken, Promod Haque, Extreme Networks, Inc., Alicia Jayne Moore and Michael J Palu
Case Number: 5:2007cv02268
Filed: April 25, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 160 Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/18/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
September 22, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 156 to Continue Case Management Conference and Defer Pending Discovery Deadlines: Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/22/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
August 25, 2010 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 150 Granting the Parties Suggestion for Rescheduling of Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/25/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 6, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 125 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/6/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 9, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 135 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/9/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
April 2, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 112 , 114 Motion for Reconsideration, or in the alternative, for Stay and Certificate of Appealability. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
December 30, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing on 114 MOTION to Stay and setting briefing schedule for 112 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/30/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
November 17, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 101 Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
October 1, 2008 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 89 Motion to Intervene and for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Selection of Lead Counsel. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 23, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 85 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 8, 2008 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 88 Re: Motion for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, Motion to Intervene and Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/8/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
February 6, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 63 to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/6/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Stitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold L. Covert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Scherbarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon L Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Haddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vito E. Palermo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank C. Carlucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Slakey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Carinalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Silverglide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Wolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promod Haque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extreme Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Alexis Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Jayne Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Palu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yenna Wu
Represented By: Emanuel Shachmurove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank A. Grucel, Jr.
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Erikson
Represented By: Emanuel Shachmurove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?